HI SB514 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - The committee on THA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - The committee on THA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for a temporary housing pilot program to be developed on Hawaiian homestead lands by the department of human services as an alternative housing solution for homelessness.
Title
Homeless; Housing; Pilot Program; Temporary Housing; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee on THA deferred the measure. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/THA deferred the measure until 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/THA, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1347 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to HUS/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 7
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=514&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB514_.HTM |