HI SB514 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Nakashima, Ward excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Nakashima, Ward excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a class C felony for theft of any computer that contains or has access to personal information. (SB514 HD1)
Title
Theft; Personal Electronic Devices
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Nakashima, Ward excused. |
2015-03-20 | House | Deferred one day, Monday, 03-23-15. |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 150) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 608) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB781 (Same As) 2015-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1).