HI SB518 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HEA/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HEA/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers fee title ownership of certain undeveloped land in Kapolei from the University of Hawaii to the department of land and natural resources.
Title
West Oahu Land Transfer; University of Hawaii; Department of Land and Natural Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HEA/WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA/WTL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HEA/WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=518&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB518_.HTM |