HI SB540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Converts the long-term care community living program specialist position within the executive office on aging from exempt to permanent civil service status.
Title
Relating To Long-term Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB434 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB540 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
SB540 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
Civil Service Status
Community Living Program
Executive Office on Aging
Kupuna Caucus
Long-term Care
Veterans
Civil Service Status
Community Living Program
Executive Office on Aging
Kupuna Caucus
Long-term Care
Veterans
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=540&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB540_.HTM |