HI SB545 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of land and natural resources for watershed management projects; fire, natural disaster, and emergency response equipment; and forest and outdoor recreation improvements.
Title
Forest Conservation; Access; Emergency Response; Outdoor Recreation; Department of Land and Natural Resources; Climate Change; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 145) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Galuteria, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman, Slom. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 2:45PM in conference room CR224. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=545&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB545_.HTM |