HI SB545 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Act 104, 07/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Act 104, 07/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates and appropriates money to a temporary commission on the thirteenth festival of pacific arts to plan for the historic event to be held in Honolulu from June 11 to June 27, 2020. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Festival Of Pacific Arts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Senate | Act 104, 07/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2017-07-10 | House | Act 104, on 07/06/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1205). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 94) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 94). |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Onishi, Holt, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 2:30PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Wakai, English Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Onishi, Holt Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1732) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from VMI/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1338), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2017-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI/TOU on Thursday, 03-23-17 9:45AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to VMI/TOU, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 196) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-17 9:40AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from IAA/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, English, S. Chang, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to IAA/ETT, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |