HI SB557 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB557
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to PVM, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to PVM, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state and county law enforcement agencies from complying with federal immigration detainers or honoring requests for non-public information unless specifically required to do so by a warrant signed by a judge or provisions of federal, state, or county law. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to PVM, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 186) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki. Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Kim, Riviere). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1070) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 10:05AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB557 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to PVM, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1247 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1247 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Federal Immigration Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement