HI SB57 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires professional architects, engineers, land surveyors, and landscape architects to present a tax clearance certificate to licensing agency prior to issuance or renewal of the license.
Title
Taxation; Tax Clearance Certificate; Professional Licensure; Architect; Engineer; Land Surveyor; Landscape Architect
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB326 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=57&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB57_.HTM |