HI SB570 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "historic property" under the Historic Preservation Law. Effective 07/30/2075. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Historic Preservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Kapela, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-15-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 18) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Ihara, Kim, San Buenaventura . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-07-22. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2056) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB245 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB570 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB570 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.