HI SB571 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB571
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state building code council to adopt net zero energy capability standards for new single-family residential construction. Requires all new single-family residential construction to be net zero capable by 1/1/2019.
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU/TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB571 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
HB1249 (Same As) 2017-03-17 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
HB1249 (Same As) 2017-03-17 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=571&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB571_.HTM |