HI SB580 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development from the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to the Department of Land and Natural Resources. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Wakai. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-06-23 10:45AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB580 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.