HI SB582 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB582
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Act 010, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Act 010, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the State's response to the August 2023 wildfires that affected the County of Maui. Makes an appropriation to the One Ohana Bank Trust Account to compensate victims of the 2023 Maui wildfires. Temporarily lifts various restrictions on the use of funds for Maui wildfire response. Appropriates moneys. Declares that the appropriations exceed the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2023-2024. Requires reports to the Legislature. (CD1)
Title
Relating To State Budget.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Act 010, 05/03/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110). |
2024-05-02 | House | Act 010, on 05/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Cochran voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 184-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 184-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hashimoto, DeCoite, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 783). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator DeCoite added as Co-Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Chair. Senator Hashimoto discharged as Co-Chair; Added as Chair. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 2:00PM; CR 309. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 767). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 309. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Hashimoto discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 309. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 2:15PM; Conference Room 309. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 698). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Hashimoto, Fevella. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 734). |
2024-04-12 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Alcos. |
2024-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 693). |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Souza excused (2). |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos, Ward. |
2024-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:30PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-24. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Received from Governor re: Typographical correction (Gov. Msg. No. 6). |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-04 | House | Received from Governor re: Recommendation for immediate passage (Gov. Msg. No. 4). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2903) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-02-27 | House | Received from Governor re: Expeditious Consideration (Gov. Msg. No. 3). |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-24 9:29AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2485) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB582 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to WAM.