HI SB583 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 31
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the 2020-2021 fiscal year, reduces from 6.5% to 5.0% the portion of the total Department of Education operating budget that may be expended for the department's administrative expenditures. Increases the percentage of appropriations for the total budget of the department that principals may expend, from 70% to 75%. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2020-02-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 10) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-10-20. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2418) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 01-29-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB583 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.