HI SB584 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to include source of project funding and amount of legislative appropriations used for some other purpose and the justification for such use in the information posted on the Department's website relating to school repair and maintenance projects.
Title
Relating To Funding For School Repair And Maintenance.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 244) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB584 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Department of Education
School Repair and Maintenance
Sources of Project Funding
Use for Other Purposes
School Repair and Maintenance
Sources of Project Funding
Use for Other Purposes
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=584&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB584_.HTM |