HI SB594 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from the general excise tax amounts received for the slaughter and processing of poultry and livestock.
Title
General Excise Tax; Processing of Poultry and Livestock; Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB747 (Same As) 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 224.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=594&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB594_.HTM |