HI SB594 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB594
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of taxation to exempt a taxpayer whose annual general excise tax liability does not exceed $100 from monthly, quarterly, or semiannual general excise tax filing requirements; provided that the taxpayer files an annual return. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Belatti. |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-12-21 11:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2021-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 20) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-18-21. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 263) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB594 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).