HI SB600 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the categories of women required to be covered for mammogram screenings. Requires the existing health insurance mandate for coverage of low-dose mammography to include digital mammography and breast tomosynthesis. Defines "digital breast tomosynthesis". Requires health care providers to be reimbursed at rates accurately reflecting the resource costs specific to each service, including any increased resource cost after 1/1/2023.
Title
Relating To Breast Cancer Screening.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB600 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
HB663 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB663 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=600&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB600_.HTM |