HI SB612 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB612
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of criminal trespass on critical electrical infrastructure.
Title
Relating To Critical Electrical Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-21 9:10AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB612 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=612&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB612_.HTM |