HI SB614 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants additional family leave to address family care, legal, and financial issues directly related to or resulting from the impending military deployment or active military deployment of the employee's child, spouse, reciprocal beneficiary, or parent. (SB614 HD2)
Title
Family Leave; Military Deployment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1236) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita, M. Lee, Souki. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-24-09 10:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting no (0) and Chang, McKelvey, Morita, Takai, Thielen excused (5). | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-17-09 7:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Referred to EBM, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 59). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Hemmings). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 538) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda, Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR will hold a public decision making on 02-24-09 2:45 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to LBR. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to LBR. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, English, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-09 1:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to PSM, LBR. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB450 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.