HI SB615 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends requirements for coverage of infertility treatments to include procedures other than in vitro fertilization; removes requirement that recipients of infertility treatment be married. Requires the covered infertility treatments to be performed at centers that conform to specific medical standards. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Health Insurance; Infertility Treatments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Recommitted to WAM. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 787) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kim, Slom. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-03-11 10:25AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |