HI SB620 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE/EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the types of businesses qualified to receive tax benefits under the state enterprise zone law to include service businesses that provide air conditioning project services from seawater air conditioning district cooling systems.
Title
Enterprise Zones; Seawater Air Conditioning
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/EET, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to ENE/EDT, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB240 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE/EET, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=620&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB620_.HTM |