HI SB626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB626
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires tire retailers to collect and submit to the Department of Health certain information relating to tires sold by the retailer. Requires the Department of Health to establish and maintain a database containing this information.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Tires.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to TCA, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS/TCA, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB626 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Re-Referred to TCA, CPN/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=626&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB626_.HTM |