HI SB638 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an exemption from county zoning-related building restrictions for an increase in floor area of the principal office of a planned community association, subject to certain conditions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Planned Community Associations; Principal Office; Zoning
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from WLH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM deferred the measure until 02-10-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM, CPN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB495 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.