HI SB639 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of land and natural resources to issue residential leases in state parks; establishes a planning council to monitor compliance with the leases. (SD1)
Title
State Parks; Residential Leases; Planning Council
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-25 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 23 | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 28) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-02-23 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (English). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-23-09. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Kokubun, Takamine, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Fukunaga. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 2:45 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |