HI SB639 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Department of Health to retain experts to identify necessary public outreach and education resources and tools and develop a comprehensive public outreach strategy and website to provide necessary information to educate homeowners to meet the State's statutory January 1, 2050, cesspool conversion deadline.
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB639 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to AEN/HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Cesspools
Department of Health
Mandatory Upgrade, Conversion, or Connection
Public Outreach and Education
Cesspools
Department of Health
Mandatory Upgrade, Conversion, or Connection
Public Outreach and Education
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=639&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB639_.HTM |