HI SB646 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the governor's power to unilaterally limit appropriations that were previously approved by the legislature to require the governor to explain in writing any decisions to reduce, withhold, or otherwise limit appropriations approved by the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Public Accountability; Executive Decisions; Transparency
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 04-03-09 5:00 PM in conference room 308. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-25-09 2:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 219) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fukunaga, Hee. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-09 9:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 9:30am in conference room 211. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |