HI SB647 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB647
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Legislative Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the membership of the state capitol management committee by including the lieutenant governor and the lieutenant governor's chief of staff. Prohibits the lieutenant governor from being represented on the committee by a designee. Requires the lieutenant governor to submit an annual report to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Capitol Management Committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB647 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1253 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LMG, referral sheet 6
HB1253 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LMG, referral sheet 6