HI SB659 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines for violations of operating a vehicle while under the influence of an intoxicant.
Title
Relating To Highway Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 197) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB659 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=659&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB659_.HTM |