HI SB659 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the low-income housing tax credit to be allocated among the partners or members of the partnership or limited liability company earning the credit in any manner agreed to by the partners or members. Requires Internal Revenue Service Form 8609 to be included with claims for the low-income housing tax credit. Specifies other restrictions and clarifies the effect of other tax provisions for buildings placed in service after 12/31/2020. Extends the increases made to the low-income housing tax credit from 12/31/2021 to an unspecified date. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2050. Effective 12/1/2050. (HD3)
Title
Relating To Low-income Housing Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630). |
2021-04-23 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 3:31PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 3:40PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-21 3:31PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Johanson, Sayama Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Moriwaki. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 527). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1876) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-21. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1412) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-18 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 245) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB659 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630).
HB378 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB378 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1