HI SB664 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the request for absentee ballot include whether the ballot is for overseas voters or in-state voters. Requires absentee ballots to be mailed no earlier than thirty days prior to the election day, if the voter is overseas, and ten days if the voter is in the State.
Title
Absentee Voting
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 9:00 AM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=664&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB664_.HTM |