HI SB668 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Part I: Requires the State to regulate all agricultural imports and inspections. Establishes the air cargo pest inspection, quarantine, and eradication fund. Part II: Renames the agricultural development and food security special fund as the land-, aquaculture-, freshwater-, or sea-based food development and food security special fund and expands the scope of the special fund to include land-, aquaculture-, freshwater-, or sea-based food production. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1482) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 03-17-21 at 10:00 AM . |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2021-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 71) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB668 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Department of Agriculture
Land-, Aquaculture-, Freshwater-, or Sea-Based Food Development and Food Security Special Fund
Pest Inspection, Quarantine, and Eradication of Invasive Species in Air Cargo
Special Fund
Land-, Aquaculture-, Freshwater-, or Sea-Based Food Development and Food Security Special Fund
Pest Inspection, Quarantine, and Eradication of Invasive Species in Air Cargo
Special Fund