HI SB669 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for programs, ceremonies, and activities commemorating the 50TH Anniversary of the Vietnam War.
Title
Vietnam War; 50th Anniversary ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 94) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB564 (Same As) 2015-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=669&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB669_.HTM |