HI SB669 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB669
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes regulations for the cultivation, manufacture, sale, and personal use of small amounts of cannabis. Decriminalizes and regulates small amounts of cannabis for personal use. Establishes taxes for cannabis sales. Takes effect 03/22/2075. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 223) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Elefante, Kidani, Richards, Shimabukuro, Wakai. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Awa, Inouye, Moriwaki). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Aquino, Wakai, Fevella ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Moriwaki; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-23 9:50AM; Conference Room 211. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 623) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-16-23 9:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-06-23 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB669 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to JHA/AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17