HI SB678 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB678
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the legislature to follow fundamental principles of the sunshine law, including: requiring a majority vote to suspend legislative rules; requiring proposed amendments on a measure to be germane to the text to be amended; and requiring all floor votes to be printed on the order of the day before consideration. Specifies that correspondence received by the legislature or any of its committees on a measure is testimony on the measure and subject to disclosure as a public record. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Legislative Provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB678 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.