HI SB707 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG/FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG/FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies and clarifies the process by which the Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs designates access organizations to oversee public, educational, and governmental channels on cable television. (SB707 HD1)
Title
Cable Television Systems; Access Organizations; Cable Advisory Committee; Director of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG/FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Ching, Manahan, Nishimoto excused (4). | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG/FIN. | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Re-referred to EBM, LMG/FIN, referral sheet 46 | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Evans, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takai, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 03-09-10 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EBM, CPC, LMG/FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deferred the measure until 02-19-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-10 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/JGO deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-17-09 at 9:30 am in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-09 9:30am in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN/JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB564 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.