HI SB713 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to continue the Emergency Environmental Workforce Program. (SB713 HD2)
Title
Emergency Environmental Workforce Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-09 4:00pm in conference room 312. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, HED, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 58 | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Morita, Chang, Rhoads, Coffman Co-Chairs; Ching. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Bunda, Slom. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 477). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Mizuno, Morita, Sagum, Takai excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-09. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-06-09 2:00pm in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Nakashima, Bertram, Hanohano, Manahan, Rhoads, Shimabukuro, Takumi, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Saiki, Finnegan. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-24-09 2:15PM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting no (0) and Chang, Luke, Mizuno, Saiki, Souki, Takai, Thielen excused (7). | |
2009-03-18 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1017), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Morita, Coffman, Chang, Chong, Ito, C. Lee, Luke, Sagum, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Har, Herkes. | |
2009-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-17-09 8:30 AM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to EEP, HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 229) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hee, Hooser, Kidani, Tokuda, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Kokubun. | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 392) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-19-09 2:45 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 2/17/2009 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |