HI SB716 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB716
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a misdemeanor for a hosting platform to collect a fee for booking services regarding transient vacation rentals that are not lawfully certified, registered, or permitted under applicable county ordinance.
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB716 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to EET/CPH, JDC/WAM.
HB26 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Re-referred to TIA, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB26 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Re-referred to TIA, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=716&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB716_.HTM |