HI SB727 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires UH to provide training on the impacts of trauma for employees responsible for investigating incidents and assisting victims of sexual and domestic violence. Improves access for confidential support services. Requires UH to annually distribute information about sexual and domestic violence prevention and disclosure protocols to students and employees. To the extent possible, requires a private college or university to implement identical campus safety and accountability standards to those applicable to UH.
Title
Relating To Campus Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB691 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB727 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - Re-Referred to JDC.
SB727 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=727&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB727_.HTM |