HI SB730 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB730
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes term limits of not more than the lesser of three terms or twelve years for members of the board of trustees, office of Hawaiian affairs.
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB831 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB730 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
SB730 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=730&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB730_.HTM |