HI SB733 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB733
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of Hawaiian affairs to conduct a feasibility study on establishing Native Hawaiian cultural centers within the State. Requires the Office to submit a report of its study findings and recommendations to the legislature. Appropriates funds for the study. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Culture.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-15 | House | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-15-23 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 245) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB733 (Carry Over) 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1434 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB1434 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3