HI SB735 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to identify and designate affordable housing receiving zones to facilitate the development of affordable housing. (SD1)
Title
Affordable Housing; Receiving Zones
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from EDH/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 02-18-09 1:15 pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Tsutsui, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/TIA deferred the measure until 02-11-09 1:15 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/TIA deferred the measure until 02-11-09 1:15 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH-TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDH/TIA, WTL. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |