HI SB735 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of planning to convene a task force to review all requirements under chapter 205, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and make recommendations to ensure that the land use commission considers the cumulative and long-term impacts of all pending and proposed development requests during its review of reclassification petitions. Requires the task force, with the assistance of the legislative reference bureau, to report its findings to the legislature.
Title
Land Use Commission; Decision Making Criteria; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Shimabukuro. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |