HI SB745 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB745
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum insurance coverage requirement for bodily injury liability coverage to $30,000 for bodily injury or death of any person in any one accident and removes limits for two or more persons in any one accident. Increases the minimum insurance coverage requirement for property damage to $50,000.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB745 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=745&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB745_.HTM |