HI SB747 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB747
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to AEN, CPN.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to AEN, CPN.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits using geographic origins of coffee in labeling or advertising for roasted or instant coffee that contains less than a certain percentage of coffee by weight from that geographic origin, phased in to a minimum of fifty-one per cent after 7/1/2025. Prohibits use of the term "All Hawaiian" in labeling or advertising for roasted or instant coffee not produced entirely from green coffee beans grown and processed in Hawaii.
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB747 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to AEN, CPN.
HB259 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
HB259 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=747&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB747_.HTM |