HI SB756 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 225, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Act 225, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a mortgage license exemption for seller-financed mortgage loans, if certain conditions are met. Requires the seller to provide to the buyer the terms of the financing. Requires the seller to provide a disclaimer, to be initialed by the buyer, regarding the financing. (CD1)
Title
Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; Seller Exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Act 225, 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2015-07-10 | House | Act 225, on 07/09/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 31). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Rhoads; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 at 4:00 pm in conference room 016. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-15 9:20AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-27 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Woodson, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 539). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1612) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15 at 2:05 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-31-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1002) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 196) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-25-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB866 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to CPN.