HI SB761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB761
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a transition to silent, clean electric mopeds by prohibiting a retailer from selling or offering for sale combustion engine-powered mopeds after 12/31/2022.
Title
Relating To Mopeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB761 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=761&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB761_.HTM |