HI SB771 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB771
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a criminal penalty and monetary fines for aquarium fishing violations. Clarifies that each fish or aquatic life specimen taken in violation of certain fishing laws regarding aquarium fish and the possession and use of prohibited explosives, electrofishing devices, and poisonous substances constitutes a separate offense.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Brenton Awa [R] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=771&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB771_.HTM |