HI SB776 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB776
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State to phase out the use of private correctional facilities to incarcerate Hawaii inmates. Prohibits the construction of new correctional facilities or the expansion of existing correctional facilities without the approval of the Hawaii correctional system oversight commission.
Title
Relating To The Phaseout Of Private Correctional Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB776 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
HB1080 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
HB1080 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=776&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB776_.HTM |