HI SB783 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB783
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provision that makes claiming of the Important Agricultural Land Qualified Agricultural Cost Tax Credit contingent upon the tax credit for the aquarium and marine science research facility at Ko Olina Resort and the training and educational facilities at Makaha Resort. Expands the definition of "qualified agricultural costs." Repeals the provision that requires the Department of Agriculture to cease certifying credits after 2017. (SB783 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-18 10:02AM in conference room 224. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 828). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Galuteria Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, Cullen Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Thielen. |
2018-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 493). |
2018-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1933-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-22-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 262) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 87) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB572 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB783 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB783 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).