HI SB787 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the auditor to conduct a study on the effects of requiring insurers to cover infertility procedures.
Title
Health Insurance; Infertility Procedure Coverage; Auditor; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=787&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB787_.HTM |